US SB3287 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes or modifies provisions to provide for standardized government-wide financial management requirements. Each agency Chief Financial Officer must oversee and provide leadership in the areas of budget formulation and execution, planning and performance, risk management, internal controls, financial systems, and accounting. The bill requires the government-wide financial management plan to include actions for improving financial management systems, strengthening the federal financial management workforce, and linking performance and cost information to budget decision-making. The bill requires (1) the development of financial management performance-based metrics, and (2) an assessment of performance by such metrics to be included in the government-wide and agency-level financial management plans and status reports.
Title
CFO Vision Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-17 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7560-7561) |
2020-12-16 | Senate | The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7558-7560) |
2020-12-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.2711 Amendment SA 2711 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.2711 Amendment SA 2711 proposed by Senator Moran for Senator Enzi. (consideration: CR S7560; text: CR S7560) To improve the bill. |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7558-7561) |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 572. |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-278. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1043-1044) |
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government operations and politics
Performance measurement
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government operations and politics
Performance measurement