US SB332 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 535.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 535.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to brief Congress and report on the efforts of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide benefits to veterans who served in the Republic of Vietnam between January 9, 1962, and May 7, 1975, and have specified diseases associated with exposure to certain herbicide agents (i.e., chloracne, porphyria cutanea tarda, or acute or subacute peripheral neuropathy). The VA must implement recommendations from the GAO report related to the adjudication of claims for benefits for veterans with the specified diseases.
Title
Agent Orange Exposure Fairness Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 535. |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB566 (Related) 2019-02-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Conflicts and wars
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Military personnel and dependents
Neurological disorders
Veterans' medical care
Vietnam
Asia
Conflicts and wars
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Military personnel and dependents
Neurological disorders
Veterans' medical care
Vietnam