US SB3332 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 501.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 501.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 5, United States Code, to provide for the halt in pension payments for Members of Congress sentenced for certain offenses, and for other purposes.
Title
No CORRUPTION Act No Congressionally-Obligated Recurring Revenue Used as Pensions To Incarcerated Officials Now Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 501. |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-243. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5980 (Related) 2020-02-26 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Congress
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Members of Congress
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Members of Congress