US SB3342 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Controlled Substances Act to prohibit the deceptive sale of fentanyl, and for other purposes.
Title
Zero Tolerance for Deceptive Fentanyl Trafficking Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1622 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2935 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB5771 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2701 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3148 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
HB2935 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB5771 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2701 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3148 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Marketing and advertising
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Marketing and advertising
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3342/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3342/BILLS-116s3342is.pdf |