US SB3361 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fair Trade with China Enforcement Act
Title
Fair Trade with China Enforcement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4747 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB6001 (Related) 2018-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
SB2391 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2826 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2625-2627)
HB6001 (Related) 2018-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
SB2391 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2826 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2625-2627)
Subjects
Agricultural equipment and machinery
Alliances
Asia
Aviation and airports
China
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computers and information technology
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign trade and international finance
Free trade and trade barriers
Genetics
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hong Kong
Human rights
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax exclusion
Income tax rates
Industrial policy and productivity
Intellectual property
Internet and video services
Manufacturing
Marine and inland water transportation
Materials
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Motor vehicles
Protest and dissent
Public contracts and procurement
Railroads
Securities
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Tariffs
Taxation of foreign income
Technology transfer and commercialization
Telephone and wireless communication
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Wages and earnings
Alliances
Asia
Aviation and airports
China
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computers and information technology
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign trade and international finance
Free trade and trade barriers
Genetics
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hong Kong
Human rights
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax exclusion
Income tax rates
Industrial policy and productivity
Intellectual property
Internet and video services
Manufacturing
Marine and inland water transportation
Materials
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Motor vehicles
Protest and dissent
Public contracts and procurement
Railroads
Securities
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Tariffs
Taxation of foreign income
Technology transfer and commercialization
Telephone and wireless communication
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3361/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3361/BILLS-115s3361is.pdf |