US SB3374 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
More closely aligns the federal privacy standards applicable to substance-use disorder patient records with the relevant privacy and de-identification standards applicable to other records that contain personal health information for the purposes of (1) treatment, payment, and health care operations by health plans, providers, or clearinghouses; and (2) disclosures to public health authorities. The bill requires patients to give affirmative, written consent; once given, that consent applies to future disclosures. Such consent may be revoked by written request. The bill also (1) aligns criminal penalties for certain violations involving substance-use disorder patient records with the penalties that apply to violations involving other types of records containing personal health information; (2) expands the current prohibition against using substance-use disorder patient records in criminal proceedings to include any use in specified federal, state, and local criminal and civil actions; and (3) prohibits certain discrimination based on the release of such patient information with respect to access to treatment, employment, housing, and certain social services and benefits.
Title
‘Protecting Jessica Grubb’s Legacy Act'
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2062 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability and health-based discrimination
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Health
Health information and medical records
Housing discrimination
Judicial procedure and administration
Prescription drugs
Right of privacy
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability and health-based discrimination
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Health
Health information and medical records
Housing discrimination
Judicial procedure and administration
Prescription drugs
Right of privacy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3374/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3374/BILLS-116s3374is.pdf |