US SB3398 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 491.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 491.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the framework governing the prevention of online sexual exploitation of children. Among other things, the bill does the following: establishes the National Commission on Online Child Sexual Exploitation Prevention, directs the commission to develop best practices for interactive online services providers (e.g., Facebook and Twitter) to prevent the online sexual exploitation of children, limits the liability protections of online service providers with respect to claims alleging violations of child sexual exploitation laws, and replaces statutory references to child pornography with child sexual abuse material.
Title
EARN IT Act of 2020 Eliminating Abusive and Rampant Neglect of Interactive Technologies Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 491. |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8454 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Business records
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Domestic violence and child abuse
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Human trafficking
Internet and video services
Legislative rules and procedure
Pornography
Sex offenses
Business records
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Domestic violence and child abuse
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Human trafficking
Internet and video services
Legislative rules and procedure
Pornography
Sex offenses