US SB3414 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Became Public Law No: 116-144. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Became Public Law No: 116-144. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs to carry out specified major medical facility projects during FY2020. The bill also indicates the maximum amount that can be spent on each project.
Title
Major Medical Facility Authorization Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-144. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-05-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-05-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2328) |
2020-05-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3414. |
2020-05-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2328-2329) |
2020-05-28 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-03-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1613-1614; text: CR S1614) |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Building construction
California
Caribbean area
Department of Veterans Affairs
Floods and storm protection
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Kentucky
Neurological disorders
New York City
Puerto Rico
U.S. territories and protectorates
Veterans' medical care
Building construction
California
Caribbean area
Department of Veterans Affairs
Floods and storm protection
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Kentucky
Neurological disorders
New York City
Puerto Rico
U.S. territories and protectorates
Veterans' medical care