US SB3418 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-284.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-284.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to enter into agreements with any state or Indian tribal government to make capitalization grants for the establishment of hazard mitigation revolving loan funds. Such funds shall provide funding assistance to local governments to carry out projects to reduce disaster risk in order to decrease the loss of life and property, the cost of insurance claims, and federal disaster payments. FEMA shall not be liable for any claim based on the exercise or performance of, or the failure to exercise or perform, a discretionary function or duty by FEMA or by a FEMA employee in carrying out this bill.
Title
STORM Act Safeguarding Tomorrow through Ongoing Risk Mitigation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-284. |
2021-01-01 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7264-7266) |
2020-12-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3418. |
2020-12-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7264-7268) |
2020-12-18 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-12-14 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7370-7372) |
2020-12-09 | Senate | S.Amdt.2697 Amendment SA 2697 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-09 | Senate | S.Amdt.2697 Amendment SA 2697 proposed by Senator Inhofe for Senator Peters. (consideration: CR S7377; text: CR S7370-7372) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-12-09 | Senate | The committee amendments withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7375-7377) |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7375-7377) |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 511. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-249. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3779 (Related) 2020-09-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 389.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
American Samoa
Atmospheric science and weather
Caribbean area
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Guam
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Infrastructure development
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Lakes and rivers
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Natural disasters
Northern Mariana Islands
Roads and highways
Seashores and lakeshores
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Virgin Islands
Watersheds
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
American Samoa
Atmospheric science and weather
Caribbean area
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Floods and storm protection
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Guam
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Infrastructure development
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Lakes and rivers
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Natural disasters
Northern Mariana Islands
Roads and highways
Seashores and lakeshores
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Virgin Islands
Watersheds