US SB342 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 113.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 113.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pine Forest Range Recreation Enhancement Act of 2013 - Designates specified federal land managed by the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) in Humboldt County, Nevada, and to be known as the Pine Forest Range Wilderness, as wilderness and as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System. Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to take necessary measures in such wilderness to control fire, insects, and diseases. Releases BLM land in any part of the Blue Lakes and Alder Creek wilderness study areas not designated as wilderness by this Act from further study for wilderness designation. Authorizes land exchanges involving identified federal and non-federal lands in Humboldt County.
Title
Pine Forest Range Recreation Enhancement Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 113. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-59. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-28. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced in Senate: CR S776-778) |
Same As/Similar To
HB433 (Related) 2013-07-23 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB5205 (Related) 2014-09-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB5205 (Related) 2014-09-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Nevada
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Land transfers
Nevada
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats