US SB3450 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs to continue to provide educational assistance through December 21, 2020, for programs of education that have been converted to distance learning due to an emergency or health-related situation. Such assistance includes monthly housing stipends or subsistence allowances.
Title
A bill to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to treat certain programs of education converted to distance learning by reason of emergencies and health-related situations in the same manner as programs of education pursued at educational institutions, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6194 (Related) 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB3503 (Same As) 2020-03-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-128. (TXT | PDF)
SB3503 (Same As) 2020-03-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-128. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Educational technology and distance education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Educational technology and distance education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3450/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3450/BILLS-116s3450is.pdf |