US SB3462 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-266.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-266.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 909 West Holiday Drive in Fate, Texas, as the "Ralph Hall Post Office."
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 909 West Holiday Drive in Fate, Texas, as the "Ralph Hall Post Office".
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-266. |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-10 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7137) |
2020-12-10 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7137) |
2020-12-10 | House | Ms. Kelly (IL) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2020-11-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-11-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7081; text: CR S7081) |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 495. |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5987 (Same As) 2020-10-01 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 565.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Postal service
Texas
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Postal service
Texas