US SB347 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 40 Fulton Street in Middletown, New York, as the "Benjamin A. Gilman Post Office Building."
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 40 Fulton Street in Middletown, New York, as the "Benjamin A. Gilman Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-08-02 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5204; text: CR S5204) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 85. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
New York State
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
New York State
Postal service