US SB3499 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-3)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires specified public health care programs and private health insurance to cover testing for COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) without imposing cost-sharing (e.g., deductibles, coinsurance, or copayments) for the duration of the public health emergency declared on January 31, 2020. This coverage includes the cost of administering such approved tests and related visits to health care providers.Specifically, these requirements apply to COVID-19 testing and office visits for individuals covered through (1) Medicare, (2) Medicare Advantage, (3) Medicaid, (4) the Children's Health Insurance Program, (5) the Department of Defense (i.e., TRICARE), (6) the Department of Veterans Affairs, (7) the Federal Employees Health Benefits Program, or (8) the Indian Health Service. Additionally, state Medicaid programs may cover COVID-19 testing and related visits for uninsured individuals during the emergency, and the Department of Health and Human Services must reimburse laboratories for the cost of such tests.
Title
Free COVID–19 Testing Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6201 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Engrossment Correction
HB6213 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6214 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6232 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6244 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6261 (Related) 2020-04-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HB6263 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6213 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6214 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6232 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6244 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6261 (Related) 2020-04-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HB6263 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Department of Health and Human Services
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Executive agency funding and structure
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medicaid
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Minority health
State and local finance
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Department of Health and Human Services
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Executive agency funding and structure
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medicaid
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Minority health
State and local finance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3499/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3499/BILLS-116s3499is.pdf |