US SB3505 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Shortens the time frame under which private health insurance plans must cover certain new preventative services related to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Under current law, health plans have one year to cover services recommended by the United States Preventive Services Task Force or the Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices. Under this bill, health plans must cover such services to prevent or diagnose COVID-19 within 15 days.
Title
Rapid Coverage for Coronavirus Vaccines Act
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB6299 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB6299 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3548 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3505/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3505/BILLS-116s3505is.pdf |