US SB3523 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Full Military Honors Act of 2018 This bill provides full military honors for the funeral of an eligible veteran who: is first interred or inurned in Arlington National Cemetery on or after enactment of this bill, was awarded the medal of honor or the prisoner-of-war medal, and is not entitled to full military honors because of such veteran's grade.
Title
Full Military Honors Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7897) |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7897) |
2018-10-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.4053 Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6734 (Same As) 2018-09-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Virginia
Cemeteries and funerals
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Virginia