US SB3546 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Preserves the eligibility of health savings account (HSA) participants covered by any health plan during the coronavirus emergency period. The coronavirus emergency period is the period beginning on March 13, 2020, and ending on the later of (1) the last day on which a presidential declaration of emergency under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act with respect to the coronavirus (i.e., the virus that causes COVID-19) is in effect, or (2) the last day on which a presidential declaration of national emergency under the National Emergencies Act with respect to the coronavirus is in effect.
Title
Pandemic Healthcare Access Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6338 (Same As) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4537 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4537 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax deductions
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Taxation
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax deductions
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3546/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3546/BILLS-116s3546is.pdf |