US SB3548 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CARES Act Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act This bill addresses economic impacts of, and otherwise responds to, the COVID-19 (coronavirus) outbreak. The bill authorizes emergency loans to distressed businesses, including air carriers, and suspends certain aviation excise taxes. With respect to small businesses, the bill establishes, and provides funding for, forgivable bridge loans; and provides additional funding for grants and technical assistance. The bill also provides funding for $1,200 tax rebates to individuals, with additional $500 payments per qualifying child. The rebate begins phasing out when incomes exceed $75,000 (or $150,000 for joint filers). The bill establishes limits on requirements for employers to provide paid leave. With respect to taxes, the bill establishes special rules for certain tax-favored withdrawals from retirement plans; delays due dates for employer payroll taxes and estimated tax payments for corporations; and revises other provisions, including those related to losses, charitable deductions, and business interest. With respect to health care, the bill provides additional funding for the prevention, diagnosis, and treatment of COVID-19; limits liability for volunteer health care professionals; prioritizes Food and Drug Administration (FDA) review of certain drugs; allows emergency use of certain diagnostic tests that are not approved by the FDA; expands health-insurance coverage for diagnostic testing and requires coverage for preventative services and vaccines; revises other provisions, including those regarding the medical supply chain, the national stockpile, the health care workforce, the Healthy Start program, telehealth services, nutrition services, Medicare, and Medicaid. With respect to education, the bill temporarily suspends payments for federal student loans; and otherwise revises provisions related to campus-based aid, supplemental educational-opportunity grants, federal work-study, subsidized loans, Pell grants, and foreign institutions. The bill also authorizes the Department of the Treasury to temporarily guarantee money-market funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CARES Act Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-03SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
2020-03-21SenateS.Amdt.1563 Referred to the Committee on Finance.
2020-03-21SenateS.Amdt.1562 Referred to the Committee on Finance.
2020-03-20SenateS.Amdt.1561 Referred to the Committee on Finance.
2020-03-19SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S1834-1859)

Same As/Similar To

HB1922 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB2985 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3708 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB4100 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4509 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4801 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
HB4870 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5443 (Related) 2019-12-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2326 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2589 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2619 (Related) 2019-11-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 288.
SB2629 (Related) 2020-01-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2999 (Related) 2019-12-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3220 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3374 (Related) 2020-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3438 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3437 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB748 (Related) 2020-03-31 - POSITION STATEMENTS FOR THE RECORD - The Chair announced that all Members may have five legislative days in which to include their stated position on the voice vote on the motion to concur in the Senate amendment to H.R. 748, and those statements will appear in the appropriate point in the Record. Agreed to without objection.
SB3468 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6283 (Related) 2020-03-13 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6282 (Related) 2020-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB3505 (Related) 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3535 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S1834)
SB3539 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3478 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S1743)
HB6315 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Aviation and airports
Business education
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Charitable contributions
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Corporation for National and Community Service
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability and health-based discrimination
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Economic performance and conditions
Economics and public finance
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Employee hiring
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Employment taxes
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal preemption
Financial crises and stabilization
Financial services and investments
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Food assistance and relief
Foreign and international corporations
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Home and outpatient care
Hospital care
Housing discrimination
Immunology and vaccination
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Judicial procedure and administration
Manufacturing
Medicaid
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Minority education
Motor fuels
National and community service
Nutrition and diet
Prescription drugs
Right of privacy
Rural conditions and development
Sales and excise taxes
Securities
Small business
Small Business Administration
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Strategic materials and reserves
Student aid and college costs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation of foreign income
Temporary and part-time employment
Transportation employees
U.S. territories and protectorates
Unemployment
User charges and fees
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
Wages and earnings
Women in business

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback