US SB3586 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Terminates (1) the taxpayer election to designate $3 of income tax liability for financing of presidential election campaigns, (2) the Presidential Election Campaign Fund, and (3) the Presidential Primary Matching Payment Account. The Department of the Treasury must transfer funds remaining in the Presidential Election Campaign Fund to the Department of Health and Human Services to acquire unexpired personal protective equipment (including face masks) for the strategic national stockpile.
Title
Eliminating Leftover Expenses for Campaigns from Taxpayers (ELECT) Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5956 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3225 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6500 (Same As) 2020-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3225 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6500 (Same As) 2020-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Department of Health and Human Services
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Health technology, devices, supplies
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Strategic materials and reserves
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Health technology, devices, supplies
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Strategic materials and reserves
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3586/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3586/BILLS-116s3586is.pdf |