US SB3587 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-213. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-213. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to report to Congress regarding the accessibility of VA websites (including attached files and web-based applications) to individuals with disabilities. The report shall identify websites, files, and applications that are not accessible to such individuals and include the VA's plan to make each of them accessible.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs Website Accessibility Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-213. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-04 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-11-24 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-11-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5744-5745) |
2020-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3587. |
2020-11-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5744-5745) |
2020-11-16 | House | Mrs. Luria moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-03-26 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-03-26 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2158-2159; text: CR S2158-2159) |
Same As/Similar To
SB746 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation