US SB3591 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-09 - An errata sheet on written report No. 116-288 was printed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies water resources development projects operated by the Army Corps of Engineers and clean water programs operated by the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA). The bill modifies cost share requirements for the construction and major rehabilitation of certain inland waterways navigation projects. Additionally, the nonfederal cost share for certain projects may be reduced if a small or disadvantaged community's sustainability would be threatened without the project. Similarly, the Corps of Engineers may recommend a project without national economic development benefits if the project is necessary for an underserved, economically distressed, or rural community's sustainability. The Corps of Engineers must also construct small water storage projects in rural states. The bill authorizes new projects, including projects for ecosystem restoration, flood risk management, and navigation. The bill also establishes programs for the prevention and control of certain invasive species. Additionally, the EPA must provide specified assistance to small and medium publicly owned treatment works. Further, the EPA must award grants to small publicly owned treatment works for activities including those related to improving energy and waste efficiency. The EPA must also award grants to reduce emissions at ports from vessels. Further, the bill reauthorizes through FY2024 the Clean Water State Revolving Fund, which provides financing for water quality infrastructure projects. The bill also reauthorizes through FY2030 the Indian Irrigation Fund, which provides funds to maintain and repair Indian irrigation projects. The Government Accountability Office must report on federal dams and reservoirs in western states.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

America's Water Infrastructure Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-09SenateAn errata sheet on written report No. 116-288 was printed.
2020-11-09SenateBy Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-288.
2020-05-11SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 453.
2020-05-11SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2020-05-04SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Same As/Similar To

SB3633 (Related) 2020-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB1132 (Related) 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate.
HB2470 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB3510 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB5476 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB1811 (Related) 2020-12-09 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
SB2164 (Related) 2019-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2636 (Related) 2019-10-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB3082 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB3603 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB6826 (Related) 2020-05-12 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6985 (Related) 2020-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB7116 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB3758 (Related) 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-191. (TXT | PDF)
HB7705 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback