US SB3607 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Became Public Law No: 116-157. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Safeguarding America's First Responders Act of 2020 This bill extends death and disability benefits under the Public Safety Officers' Benefits Program (PSOB) to public safety officers (e.g., law enforcement officers) and survivors of public safety officers who die or become injured as a result of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). The PSOB program provides death, disability, and education benefits to public safety officers and survivors of public safety officers who are killed or injured in the line of duty. For purposes of death benefits, this bill creates a general presumption that a public safety officer who dies from COVID-19 or related complications sustained a personal injury in the line of duty. For purposes of disability benefits, the bill creates a general presumption that COVID-19 or related complications suffered by a public safety officer constitutes a personal injury sustained in the line of duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safeguarding America's First Responders Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-14HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-157. (TXT | PDF)
2020-08-14HouseSigned by President.
2020-08-04HousePresented to President.
2020-07-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-07-20HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H3109-3110)
2020-07-20HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H3109-3110)
2020-07-20HouseMr. Cicilline asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
2020-05-15HouseHeld at the desk.
2020-05-15HouseReceived in the House.
2020-05-15SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-05-14SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (text: CR S2464)
2020-05-14SenateS.Amdt.1587 Amendment SA 1587 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2020-05-14SenateS.Amdt.1587 Amendment SA 1587 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S2464; text: CR S2464) To improve the bill.
2020-05-14SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
2020-05-14SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2464)
2020-05-05SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

HB7031 (Same As) 2020-05-27 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback