US SB3623 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HIRE Now Tax Cut Extension Act of 2010 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend until June 30, 2011, the exemption from payment of employment taxes for individuals who begin employment after July 22, 2010.
Title
HIRE Now Tax Cut Extension Act of 2010
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6105 (Same As) 2010-08-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3706 (Related) 2010-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3706 (Related) 2010-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/3623/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s3623/BILLS-111s3623is.pdf |