US SB3646 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes measures to reduce the number of individuals in federal custody during a national emergency relating to a communicable disease. Specifically, it does the following: requires certain categories of inmates to be released and placed in community supervision (e.g., home confinement); limits the use of pretrial detention; and modifies supervised release, including to suspend the request for detention and imprisonment as a sanction for a violation of probation, supervised release, or parole.
Title
Emergency Community Supervision Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3579 (Related) 2020-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6400 (Related) 2020-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB6400 (Related) 2020-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Cancer
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Evidence and witnesses
Federal district courts
HIV/AIDS
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Judicial review and appeals
Neurological disorders
Women's health
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Evidence and witnesses
Federal district courts
HIV/AIDS
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Judicial review and appeals
Neurological disorders
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3646/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3646/BILLS-116s3646is.pdf |