US SB3650 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends federal torts claim coverage for certain personal injury claims (i.e., medical malpractice liability protection) to urban Indian organizations and their employees by deeming them as part of the Public Health Service. Currently, such coverage is provided to Indian tribes, tribal organizations, Indian contractors, and their employees.
Title
Coverage for Urban Indian Health Providers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6535 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-313.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Department of Health and Human Services
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government liability
Health care quality
Health personnel
Indian social and development programs
Minority health
Native Americans
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Department of Health and Human Services
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government liability
Health care quality
Health personnel
Indian social and development programs
Minority health
Native Americans
Urban and suburban affairs and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3650/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3650/BILLS-116s3650is.pdf |