US SB3681 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation (DOT), the Department of Homeland Security, and the Department of Health and Human Services to form a joint task force on air travel during and after the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) public health emergency. The task force must develop recommended requirements, plans, and guidelines to address the health, safety, security, and logistical issues relating to the continuation of air travel during the COVID-19 public health emergency, as well as the resumption of full operations at airports and increased passenger air travel after the COVID-19 public health emergency ends. DOT must establish a joint federal advisory committee to advise the task force to include developing and submitting policy recommendations to the task force regarding the recommended requirements, plans, and guidelines that the task force must develop. Additionally, DOT must publish the policy recommendations on a publicly accessible website.
Title
Ensuring Health Safety in the Skies Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-10-01 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5997-5998) |
2020-09-30 | Senate | The committee amendment to the title agreed to by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | S.Amdt.2677 Amendment SA 2677 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | S.Amdt.2677 Amendment SA 2677 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Markey. (consideration: CR S6003; text: CR S5997-5998) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6002-6003) |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 508. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 116-246. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB7177 (Related) 2020-08-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security.
HB7177 (Related) 2020-08-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Aviation and airports
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Right of privacy
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism
Worker safety and health
Aviation and airports
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Right of privacy
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism
Worker safety and health