US SB3731 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Social Security Administration to provide a single point of contact for any individual whose Social Security account number has been misused. The single point of contact must track the individual's case to completion and coordinate with other specialized units to resolve case issues as quickly as possible.
Title
Improving Social Security's Service to Victims of Identity Theft Act
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-06-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/29/20 CR S3977) |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3024) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5446 (Same As) 2019-12-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Executive agency funding and structure
Social Security Administration
Social welfare
Executive agency funding and structure
Social Security Administration
Social welfare