US SB3734 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 636.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 636.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for a coordinated Federal research initiative to ensure continued United States leadership in engineering biology.
Title
Bioeconomy Research and Development Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 636. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-330. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4373 (Related) 2019-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.