US SB3744 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-145. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-145. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes sanctions on foreign individuals and entities responsible for human rights abuses in China's Xinjiang Uyghur Autonomous region and requires various reports on the topic. The President shall periodically report to Congress a list identifying foreign individuals and entities responsible for such human rights abuses. The President shall impose (1) property-blocking sanctions on the identified individuals and entities, and (2) visa-blocking sanctions on the identified individuals. The bill requires reports to Congress on (1) human rights abuses in Xinjiang; (2) efforts to protect U.S. citizens and residents, including ethnic Uyghurs and Chinese nationals studying or working in the United States, from harassment and intimidation by the Chinese government; and (3) the Chinese government's acquisition and development of technology to facilitate internment and mass surveillance in Xinjiang. The Office of the Director of National Intelligence shall submit a classified report to Congress on (1) Chinese government policies in Xinjiang that constitute gross violations of human rights, and (2) the scope and scale of the detention and forced labor of Muslim minority groups in China.
Title
Uyghur Human Rights Policy Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 110 (Y: 413 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-145. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-05-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-05-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 1 (Roll no. 110). (text: CR H2293-2295) |
2020-05-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2311-2312) |
2020-05-27 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-05-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3744. |
2020-05-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2293-2300) |
2020-05-27 | House | Mr. Sherman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-05-15 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-05-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2458-2461; text: CR S2459-2461) |
Subjects
Asia
China
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Foreign property
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Labor standards
News media and reporting
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Sanctions
Technology transfer and commercialization
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
China
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Foreign property
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Labor standards
News media and reporting
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Sanctions
Technology transfer and commercialization
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers