US SB375 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Payment Integrity Information Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Payment Integrity Information Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-17HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-07-17HouseReceived in the House.
2019-07-17SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-07-16SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4864-4870; text: CR S4864-4970)
2019-05-06SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 76.
2019-05-06SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-35.
2019-02-13SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-02-07SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback