US SB376 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Drought Information Act of 2013 - Amends the National Integrated Drought Information System Act of 2006 to specify that: (1) the Under Secretary of Commerce for Oceans and Atmosphere shall continue to support the National Integrated Drought Information System (NIDIS) Program, and (2) the program's purpose shall be to better inform and provide for more timely decisionmaking to reduce drought related impacts and costs. Revises NIDIS functions to require the NIDIS to, among other things: (1) provide certain information (including concerning water supplies and soil moisture), forecasts, and assessments described in the Act on both national and regional levels; and (2) continue ongoing research and monitoring activities related to drought and the role of extreme weather events and climate variability in drought. Requires the Under Secretary to provide a report to Congress concerning the NIDIS Program that includes a list of partners with whom the Under Secretary collaborates on NIDIS implementation and a description of NIDIS outreach activities. Authorizes appropriations to carry out the Act through FY2018.
Title
Drought Information Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pryor [D-AR] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-02-04 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-02-04 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S704) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text of committee substitute: CR S703-704) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | S.AMDT.2713 Amendment SA 2713 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | S.AMDT.2713 Amendment SA 2713 proposed by Senator Warren for Senator Pryor. (consideration: CR S704; text: CR S704)To reduce the authorization of appropriations amount. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S703-704) |
2013-10-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 222. |
2013-10-28 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-114. |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2431 (Related) 2014-03-06 - Became Public Law No: 113-86.
Subjects
Atmospheric science and weather
Congressional oversight
Emergency planning and evacuation
Farmland
Government information and archives
Natural disasters
Public-private cooperation
Science, technology, communications
Water use and supply
Congressional oversight
Emergency planning and evacuation
Farmland
Government information and archives
Natural disasters
Public-private cooperation
Science, technology, communications
Water use and supply