US SB3773 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Temporarily permits digital marketplace companies (e.g., Lyft, DoorDash, Airbnb, etc.) to provide benefits to workers during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic without such actions establishing those workers as employees or independent contractors or establishing the company as a joint employer under federal, state, or local laws.applies to digital marketplace companies that provide, among other things, financial assistance, health benefits, training, health checks and personal protective equipment to individuals working through such marketplaces during the period beginning on March 15, 2020, and ending on the later of June 30, 2021, or the expiration of the COVID-19 public health emergency.
Title
Helping Gig Economy Workers Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6988 (Same As) 2020-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Digital media
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Self-employed
Service industries
Telephone and wireless communication
Worker safety and health
Digital media
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Self-employed
Service industries
Telephone and wireless communication
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3773/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3773/BILLS-116s3773is.pdf |