US SB3790 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to pay the out-of-pocket expenses of individuals receiving medically-necessary care or services during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic. Specifically, the bill covers the costs for services provided through public or private health insurance and to uninsured individuals, including prescription drugs and care related to COVID-19, beginning on the date of enactment of this bill until a COVID-19 vaccine is widely available to the public.Health insurance plans are prohibited from increasing the cost-sharing requirements of plans while this program is in effect and HHS must report to Congress on the program on a weekly basis.
Title
Health Care Emergency Guarantee Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6906 (Same As) 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4490 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8020 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4490 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8020 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Debt collection
Drug therapy
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Home and outpatient care
Immunology and vaccination
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Military medicine
Minority health
Prescription drugs
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Debt collection
Drug therapy
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Home and outpatient care
Immunology and vaccination
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Military medicine
Minority health
Prescription drugs
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3790/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3790/BILLS-116s3790is.pdf |