US SB3798 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Hong Kong Autonomy Act This bill imposes sanctions on foreign individuals and entities that materially contribute to China's failure to preserve Hong Kong's autonomy. Hong Kong is part of China but has a largely separate legal and economic system with protections for civil rights such as freedom of speech. This arrangement is enshrined in (1) the Joint Declaration, a 1984 treaty pertaining to the United Kingdom's transfer of Hong Kong's sovereignty to China; and (2) the Basic Law, Hong Kong's constitutional document. The Department of State shall report annually to Congress information about (1) foreign individuals and entities that materially contributed to China's failure to comply with the Joint Declaration or the Basic Law; and (2) foreign financial institutions that knowingly conducted a significant transaction with such identified individuals and entities. An individual, entity, or financial institution may be excluded from this report for various reasons, such as to protect an intelligence source. The President shall impose property-blocking sanctions on an individual or entity named in a report, and visa-blocking sanctions on a named individual. The President shall impose various sanctions on a financial institution named in a report, such as prohibiting the institution from receiving loans from a U.S. financial institution. The President may waive or terminate the imposition of sanctions under this bill. Congress may override such a waiver or termination by passing a joint resolution of disapproval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hong Kong Autonomy Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29HouseHeld at the desk.
2020-06-29HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-06-29HouseReceived in the House.
2020-06-25SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S3285-3289)
2020-06-25SenateS.Amdt.1821 Amendment SA 1821 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2020-06-25SenateS.Amdt.1821 Amendment SA 1821 proposed by Senator Van Hollen for Senator Toomey. (consideration: CR S3285-3289; text: CR S3285-3289) In the nature of a substitute.
2020-06-25SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3285-3289)
2020-06-25SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2020-06-04SenateCommittee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
2020-05-21SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB7083 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7440 (Related) 2020-07-14 - Became Public Law No: 116-149. (TXT | PDF)
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback