US SB3824 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Trade Commission to report on, and increase awareness regarding, scams targeting older adults. Specifically, the commission must report on the number and type of scams that target older adults and provide policy recommendations to prevent such scams; revise the commission's web portal with current information about such scams, including contact information for law enforcement and adult protective services agencies; and coordinate with media outlets and law enforcement to disseminate such information.
Title
Protecting Seniors from Emergency Scams Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7699 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB7685 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
HB7685 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Subjects
Aging
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3824/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3824/BILLS-116s3824is.pdf |