US SB3827 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to take specified actions, as part of its management of the Strategic National Stockpile, to establish and maintain domestic reserves of critical medical supplies. Specifically, HHS must (1) create incentives for manufacturers of medical supplies to increase emergency stocks and diversify geographic production; (2) purchase, lease, or enter into joint ventures with respect to facilities and equipment to produce medical supplies; and (3) work with distributors to refresh and replenish medical supplies. HHS must also submit a report to Congress concerning the details of any purchase, lease, or joint venture. The department's authority under the bill to make purchases, leases, or joint ventures for medical supplies terminates on September 30, 2023.
Title
Medical Supplies for Pandemics Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6531 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB7574 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB7574 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Immunology and vaccination
Manufacturing
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Strategic materials and reserves
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Immunology and vaccination
Manufacturing
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Strategic materials and reserves
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3827/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3827/BILLS-116s3827is.pdf |