US SB3828 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-08 - Became Public Law No: 111-265.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-08 - Became Public Law No: 111-265.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Twenty-first Century Communications and Video Accessibility Act of 2010 (S. 3304), as engrossed by the Senate, to make certain technical corrections to it as well as to amendments it makes to the Communications Act of 1934. Requires the Video Programming and Emergency Access Advisory Committee, in its report to the Federal Communications Commission (FCC), to: (1) identify additional protocols for the delivery of emergency information delivered by digital broadcast television (as well as by Internet protocol); and (2) recommend any regulations that may be necessary to ensure compatibility between video programming delivered using digital broadcast television (as well as using Internet protocol). Amends the Communications Act of 1934, as amended by the Twenty-first Century Communications and Video Accessibility Act of 2010, to specify low-income individuals who are deaf-blind with respect to the requirement that the FCC establish rules defining the eligibility for relay service support of those FCC-approved programs for the distribution of specialized customer premises equipment designed to make telecommunications and related services accessible by individuals who are deaf-blind.
Title
A bill to make technical corrections in the Twenty-First Century Communications and Video Accessibility Act of 2010 and the amendments made by that Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pryor [D-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-08 | Became Public Law No: 111-265. | |
2010-10-08 | Signed by President. | |
2010-09-30 | Presented to President. | |
2010-09-28 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-09-28 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-09-28 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7176-7177) | |
2010-09-28 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3828. | |
2010-09-28 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7176-7177) | |
2010-09-28 | Mr. Markey (MA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2010-09-23 | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. | |
2010-09-23 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-09-23 | Received in the House. | |
2010-09-22 | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7363; text as passed Senate: CR S7363) |
Same As/Similar To
SB3304 (Related) 2010-12-22 - By Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 111-386.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Disability and paralysis
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Television and film
Disability and paralysis
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Television and film