US SB3841 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ordered held at desk by unanimous consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to protect 2020 recovery rebates for individuals from assignment or garnishment, and for other purposes. This bill prohibits the attachment of a 2020 recovery rebate by legal process, including assignment, levy, or garnishment. A 2020 recovery rebate is a stimulus payment made to individual taxpayers and their dependents who have been affected by the COVID-19 (coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to protect 2020 recovery rebates for individuals from assignment or garnishment, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23SenateOrdered held at desk by unanimous consent.
2020-07-23SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4488-4489)
2020-07-23SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4488-4489)
2020-05-21SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB6850 (Related) 2020-05-13 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4318 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback