US SB3886 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to prohibit the use of funds for an explosive nuclear weapons test.
Title
PLANET Act Preserving Leadership Against Nuclear Explosives Testing Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7140 (Same As) 2020-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB4045 (Related) 2020-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB7260 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4045 (Related) 2020-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB7260 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Nuclear weapons
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Nuclear weapons
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3886/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3886/BILLS-116s3886is.pdf |