US SB3918 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. (text: CR S2809)
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. (text: CR S2809)
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the Paycheck Protection Program, established to support small businesses in response to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019), by allowing certain farmers to calculate (or recalculate) their paycheck protection loan amount based on 2019 gross income. Under current law, such farmers must calculate their paycheck protection loan amount based on net income.
Title
Paycheck Protection for Producers Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. (text: CR S2809) |
Same As/Similar To
HB7175 (Same As) 2020-06-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB4321 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB8265 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4775 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
SB4773 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 562.
SB4321 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB8265 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4775 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
SB4773 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 562.
Subjects
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Business expenses
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Small business
Wages and earnings
Business expenses
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Small business
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3918/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3918/BILLS-116s3918is.pdf |