US SB398 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Chiropractic Care Available to All Veterans Act of 2015 Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Health Care Programs Enhancement Act of 2001 to require a program under which the Secretary of Veterans Affairs provides chiropractic care and services to veterans through Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) medical centers and clinics to be carried out at: (1) no fewer than 75 medical centers by December 31, 2016, and (2) all medical centers by December 31, 2018. Includes chiropractic examinations and services within required VA medical, rehabilitative, and preventive health care services.
Title
Chiropractic Care Available to All Veterans Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1170 (Related) 2015-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Alternative treatments
Armed forces and national security
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/398/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s398/BILLS-114s398is.pdf |