US SB3985 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure was not invoked (Record Vote No. 126) entered in Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

JUSTICE Act Just and Unifying Solutions To Invigorate Communities Everywhere Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUSTICE Act Just and Unifying Solutions To Invigorate Communities Everywhere Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24SenateMotion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure was not invoked (Record Vote No. 126) entered in Senate.
2020-06-24SenateCloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 45. Record Vote Number: 126. (CR S3170)
2020-06-22SenateCloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S3114)
2020-06-22SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S3114)
2020-06-18SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 480.
2020-06-17SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.

Same As/Similar To

HB35 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate.
HB1574 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1636 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB3536 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB488 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB855 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2163 (Related) 2020-08-14 - Became Public Law No: 116-156. (TXT | PDF)
SB2434 (Related) 2019-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4064 (Related) 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7278 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7907 (Related) 2020-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects

Academic performance and assessments
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Appropriations
Assault and harassment offenses
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Elementary and secondary education
Employee hiring
Employee performance
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hate crimes
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Minority employment
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Personnel records
Photography and imaging
Poverty and welfare assistance
Racial and ethnic relations
Sex offenses
Smithsonian Institution
State and local government operations
U.S. history
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Violent crime

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback