US SB406 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits an agency to determine whether a cyber workforce position in such agency is eligible for the rotational cyber workforce program. (That program provides for certain agency employees to detail among rotational cyber workforce positions at other agencies.) Additionally, the bill requires the Office of Personnel Management to issue a Federal Rotational Cyber Workforce Program operation plan that shall provide policies, processes, and procedures for detailing employees among rotational cyber workforce positions at agencies. The Government Accountability Office must assess the operation and effectiveness of the rotational cyber workforce program by addressing the extent to which agencies have participated in the program and the experiences of employees serving in the program.
Title
Federal Rotational Cyber Workforce Program Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-05-02 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2525-2528; text: CR S2527-2528) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 46. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. With written report No. 116-15. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
Office of Personnel Management (OPM)
Science, technology, communications
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
Office of Personnel Management (OPM)
Science, technology, communications