US SB4065 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that the Federal Trade Commission's regulation of the labeling of products as Made in the U.S.A. or Made in America supersedes any conflicting state laws.
Title
Reinforcing American-Made Products Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-07-23 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4398) |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4398) |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5088 (Related) 2019-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Buy American requirements
Commerce
Consumer affairs
Federal preemption
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Marketing and advertising
State and local government operations
Buy American requirements
Commerce
Consumer affairs
Federal preemption
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Marketing and advertising
State and local government operations