US SB4075 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-192. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-192. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces reporting requirements for recipients of Revolving Loan Fund grants, which provide funds to capitalize lending programs for businesses that cannot obtain traditional bank financing. Specifically, upon request by a qualifying grantee, the Economic Development Administration (EDA) must release any federal interest in a grant—thereby relieving the grantee of associated federal reporting requirements—if the request is made at least seven years after the final disbursement of the original grant. Currently, the EDA may release the federal interest in a grant beginning 20 years after the grant was awarded.
Title
RLF Act Reinvigorating Lending for the Future Act
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-30 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-192. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-10-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-10-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5189-5190) |
2020-10-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 4075. |
2020-10-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5189-5190) |
2020-10-01 | House | Mr. Carbajal moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-08-14 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-08-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5346) |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5346) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7388 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.