US SB4098 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Coronavirus Housing Counseling Improvement Act This bill authorizes additional housing counseling services, provided through the Neighborhood Reinvestment Corporation, with priority for funding given to counseling organizations that target and provide their services to low-income and minority homeowners, renters, individuals experiencing homelessness, and individuals at risk of homelessness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coronavirus Housing Counseling Improvement Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB6704 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB7301 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback