US SB4108 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on June 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the Medicaid Federal Medical Assistance Percentage (FMAP) for states and U.S. territories that experience economic downturns (i.e., high unemployment) beginning on or after January 1, 2020, in accordance with specified requirements and limitations. The bill's increase is in addition to previously enacted FMAP increases relating to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) but may not result in an FMAP greater than 95%.
Title
Coronavirus Medicaid Response Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6539 (Related) 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB4521 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4521 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
American Samoa
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Caribbean area
Child health
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Guam
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Medicaid
Northern Mariana Islands
Puerto Rico
State and local finance
U.S. territories and protectorates
Unemployment
Virgin Islands
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Caribbean area
Child health
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Guam
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Medicaid
Northern Mariana Islands
Puerto Rico
State and local finance
U.S. territories and protectorates
Unemployment
Virgin Islands
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4108/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4108/BILLS-116s4108is.pdf |