US SB4112 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on June 30 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Coronavirus Child Care and Education Relief Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coronavirus Child Care and Education Relief Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Same As/Similar To

HB6563 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E425)
HB7027 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HR1053 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3690 (Related) 2020-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3874 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB7932 (Related) 2020-08-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.

Subjects

Academic performance and assessments
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Adoption and foster care
Adult education and literacy
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Community life and organization
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Education
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Economic development
Education
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Educational technology and distance education
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Food assistance and relief
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Libraries and archives
Licensing and registrations
Mental health
Migrant, seasonal, agricultural labor
Minority education
Nutrition and diet
Preschool education
School administration
Special education
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Telecommunication rates and fees
Telephone and wireless communication
Vocational and technical education
Wages and earnings
Women's health
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback