US SB4116 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-147. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-147. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends through August 8, 2020, the application period for the Paycheck Protection Program established to support small businesses in response to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).
Title
A bill to extend the authority for commitments for the paycheck protection program and separate amounts authorized for other loans under section 7(a) of the Small Business Act, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-04 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-147. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-07-04 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-07-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-07-01 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H3044) |
2020-07-01 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H3044) |
2020-07-01 | House | Ms. Craig asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2020-07-01 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4024; text: CR S4024) |
Same As/Similar To
HB7437 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
Business expenses
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Small business
Wages and earnings
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Small business
Wages and earnings