US SB4138 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes permanent the Telework Enhancement Act Pilot Program in the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO). The program allows USPTO employees to telework from locations across the United States; USPTO may cover any necessary travel expenses to and from an agency worksite. The program is set to expire on December 31, 2020.
Title
Telework for U.S. Innovation Act
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7285-7286; text: CR S7285-7286) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 569. |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-276. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7448 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Commuting
Congressional oversight
Employee benefits and pensions
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Transportation costs
Travel and tourism
Congressional oversight
Employee benefits and pensions
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Transportation costs
Travel and tourism